NY A07747 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases fees for snowmobile trail development and maintenance for residents; adjusts the fee structure for snowmobile registrations for residents and non-residents of New York who do not belong to an organized New York state snowmobile club.
Title
Increases fees for snowmobile trail development and maintenance for residents; adjusts the fee structure for snowmobile registrations for residents and non-residents of New York who do not belong to an organized New York state snowmobile club.
Sponsors
Asm. William Magnarelli [D] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. D. Billy Jones [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] |
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.536 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.536 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | print number 7747b |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | print number 7747a |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S06711 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - PRINT NUMBER 6711B