NY A07746 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-29 - print number 7746a
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-29 - print number 7746a
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires landlords of rent stabilized housing accommodations to immediately add the names of the tenant's spouse to the lease and any renewals thereof upon request by the tenant.
Title
Requires landlords of rent stabilized housing accommodations to immediately add the names of the tenant's spouse to the lease and any renewals thereof upon request by the tenant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-29 | Assembly | print number 7746a |
2020-04-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S07756 (Same As) 2020-05-29 - PRINT NUMBER 7756A