NY A07745 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts provisions authorizing retail clinics to provide certain services and directs the commissioner of health to enact regulations imposing certain standards and restrictions.
Title
Enacts provisions authorizing retail clinics to provide certain services and directs the commissioner of health to enact regulations imposing certain standards and restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | referred to health |