NY A07742 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing angling by a single individual with up to three lines in freshwater; extends effectiveness of provisions for two years.
Title
Relates to authorizing angling by a single individual with up to three lines in freshwater; extends effectiveness of provisions for two years.
Sponsors
Asm. Addie Jenne [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Senate | signed chap.203 |
2017-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1804 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6239 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.568 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06239 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7742