NY A07740 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - advanced to third reading cal.742
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - advanced to third reading cal.742
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires financial institutions to notify a customer thirty days prior to charging a fee based on account inactivity; requires such notice to include a telephone number and the full contact information of a representative of the financial institution responsible for resolving any matter relating to the fee.
Title
Requires financial institutions to notify a customer thirty days prior to charging a fee based on account inactivity; requires such notice to include a telephone number and the full contact information of a representative of the financial institution responsible for resolving any matter relating to the fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.742 |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S07153 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO BANKS