NY A07740 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5788
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5788
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the India Association of Long Island, Inc. to retroactively apply for a real property tax exemption for certain properties in the hamlet of Hicksville, county of Nassau.
Title
Authorizes the India Association of Long Island, Inc. to retroactively apply for a real property tax exemption for certain properties in the hamlet of Hicksville, county of Nassau.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5788 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.479 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.479 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05788 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.356