NY A07739 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-03 - SIGNED CHAP.244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-03 - SIGNED CHAP.244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants access to local and state law enforcement of records of applications for licenses of firearms.
Title
Grants access to local and state law enforcement of records of applications for licenses of firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.244 |
2019-09-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.404 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a7739 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1203 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s6160 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.404 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.404 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06160 (Same As) 2019-09-03 - SIGNED CHAP.244