NY A07738 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - print number 7738b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - print number 7738b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including private, religious or denominational educational institutions in the "dignity for all students act".
Title
Relates to including private, religious or denominational educational institutions in the "dignity for all students act".
Sponsors
Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Assembly | print number 7738b |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | print number 7738a |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06438 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION