NY A07735 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-14 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-14 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Seymour public library district in Monroe county and provides for the means for construction and financing of facilities for the district.
Title
Creates the Seymour public library district in Monroe county and provides for the means for construction and financing of facilities for the district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-14 | Senate | tabled |
2015-08-13 | Senate | vetoed memo.192 |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5942 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.416 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.416 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7735a |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |