NY A07734 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the temporary "commission to prevent childhood drowning" to evaluate and develop programs to properly educate and instruct children how to swim and water safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the temporary "commission to prevent childhood drowning" to evaluate and develop programs to properly educate and instruct children how to swim and water safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-09Senate3RD READING CAL.1713
2021-06-09SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7129
2021-06-07SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2021-06-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.510
2021-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.510
2021-06-07Assemblyreported
2021-05-26Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-20Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S07129 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7734

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback