NY A07730 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5688
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5688
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to owner liability for failure of operator to comply with traffic-control indications in the city of White Plains, and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Relates to owner liability for failure of operator to comply with traffic-control indications in the city of White Plains, and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5688 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.678 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05688 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.222