NY A07729 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-31 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-31 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of qualified agencies; adds public defenders, legal aid societies, and assigned counsel administrators.
Title
Relates to the definition of qualified agencies; adds public defenders, legal aid societies, and assigned counsel administrators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-31 | Assembly | tabled |
2021-12-31 | Assembly | vetoed memo.76 |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1589 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7073 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.403 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.403 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07073 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7729