NY A07729 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any person engaging in clinical or academic practice under the supervision of a licensed speech-language pathologist for such period of time as may be necessary to complete an experience requirement for a professional license as a speech-language pathologist shall be eligible for a limited license.
Title
Provides that any person engaging in clinical or academic practice under the supervision of a licensed speech-language pathologist for such period of time as may be necessary to complete an experience requirement for a professional license as a speech-language pathologist shall be eligible for a limited license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Senate | signed chap.202 |
2017-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1902 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5936A |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.348 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.348 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05936 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7729