NY A07729 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - print number 7729a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - print number 7729a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Kathleen M. Dalton to have maternity leave deemed as benefits eligible service for retiree health insurance purposes.
Title
Authorizes Kathleen M. Dalton to have maternity leave deemed as benefits eligible service for retiree health insurance purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Assembly | print number 7729a |
2016-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05706 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - referred to governmental employees
A10041 (Same As) 2016-05-06 - referred to governmental employees
A10041 (Same As) 2016-05-06 - referred to governmental employees