NY A07721 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the amount of compensation for chairmen, election inspectors and ballot clerks for fire districts' elections.
Title
Relates to increasing the amount of compensation for chairmen, election inspectors and ballot clerks for fire districts' elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 7721a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05473 (Same As) 2020-02-27 - referred to ways and means