NY A07721 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of employer with respect to the duty of public employers to develop and implement programs to prevent workplace violence.
Title
Relates to the definition of employer with respect to the duty of public employers to develop and implement programs to prevent workplace violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | tabled |
2015-11-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.242 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5130 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.172 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.172 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S05130 (Same As) 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7721