NY A07716 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - SIGNED CHAP.250
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - SIGNED CHAP.250
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to presumptive evidence of disability caused by cancer of firefighters who have been retired for five years or less.
Title
Relates to presumptive evidence of disability caused by cancer of firefighters who have been retired for five years or less.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.250 |
2019-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.655 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a7716a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5246A |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.847 |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5246a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.655 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | print number 7716a |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05246 (Same As) 2019-09-11 - SIGNED CHAP.250