NY A07712 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - substituted by s5902
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - substituted by s5902
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes restrictions in the clean water infrastructure act of 2017 that emergency financial assistance will not be available under section 1285-t of the public authorities law.
Title
Removes restrictions in the clean water infrastructure act of 2017 that emergency financial assistance will not be available under section 1285-t of the public authorities law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Assembly | substituted by s5902 |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.476 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05902 (Same As) 2017-05-29 - SIGNED CHAP.30