NY A07703 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-5)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that interests or rights acquired in real property for the preservation of agricultural lands in the county of Suffolk shall permit the use of such real property for a farm operation.
Title
Provides that interests or rights acquired in real property for the preservation of agricultural lands in the county of Suffolk shall permit the use of such real property for a farm operation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | print number 7703a |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06039 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT