NY A07696 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits development of build-ready sites on viable agricultural land.
Title
Prohibits development of build-ready sites on viable agricultural land.
Sponsors
Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] |
Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-11-23 | Assembly | vetoed memo.39 |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.524 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7122 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.269 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.273 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.273 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S07122 (Same As) 2022-05-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7696