NY A07693 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a lessee who pays the real property taxes on a particular tax lot and who has been granted a contractual right to challenge the underlying real property assessment to file a complaint for administrative or judicial review of a tax assessment.
Title
Authorizes a lessee who pays the real property taxes on a particular tax lot and who has been granted a contractual right to challenge the underlying real property assessment to file a complaint for administrative or judicial review of a tax assessment.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S09199 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT