NY A07692 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - substituted by s5937
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends provisions relating to the department of environmental conservation's management of aquatic invasive species, spread prevention and penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends provisions relating to the department of environmental conservation's management of aquatic invasive species, spread prevention and penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06Assemblysubstituted by s5937
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.570
2019-05-29Assemblyreported
2019-05-16Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S05937 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.81

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback