NY A07688 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - signed chap.166
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - signed chap.166
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the ability of the New York state medical care facilities finance agency to issue certain bonds and notes.
Title
Relates to the ability of the New York state medical care facilities finance agency to issue certain bonds and notes.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Assembly | signed chap.166 |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1209 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6312 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.397 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.397 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06312 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7688