NY A07686 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing records for protection and advocacy services in a timely manner of not longer than three business days upon written request and within twenty-four hours when there is probable cause to believe the health or safety of an individual is in serious or immediate jeopardy.
Title
Relates to providing records for protection and advocacy services in a timely manner of not longer than three business days upon written request and within twenty-four hours when there is probable cause to believe the health or safety of an individual is in serious or immediate jeopardy.
Sponsors
Asm. Dan Quart [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.253 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.754 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5511 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.183 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.183 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S05511 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - tabled