NY A07682 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain entities to check the justice center's register of substantiated category one cases of abuse or neglect; prohibits certain providers of services from hiring employees who are on the register of substantiated category one cases of abuse or neglect.
Title
Requires certain entities to check the justice center's register of substantiated category one cases of abuse or neglect; prohibits certain providers of services from hiring employees who are on the register of substantiated category one cases of abuse or neglect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | print number 7682a |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S07106 (Same As) 2022-04-04 - referred to codes