NY A07680 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6184a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the growth of industrial hemp and the regulation of hemp extract and provides for the licensing of cannabinoid related hemp extract and the requirements for such licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the growth of industrial hemp and the regulation of hemp extract and provides for the licensing of cannabinoid related hemp extract and the requirements for such licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s6184a
2019-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.692
2019-06-20Assemblyreported
2019-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-20Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2019-06-10Assemblyprint number 7680a
2019-06-10Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-15Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S06184 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07680&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07680&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07680
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07680&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07680A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07680&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07680&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07680&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback