NY A07679 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s7289a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s7289a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes thyroid cancer in the list of cancers presumed to be incurred in the performance of duty for purposes of disability retirement for firefighters in a city with a population of one million or more.
Title
Includes thyroid cancer in the list of cancers presumed to be incurred in the performance of duty for purposes of disability retirement for firefighters in a city with a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s7289a |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.847 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07289 (Same As) 2023-12-08 - SIGNED CHAP.715