NY A07679 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts statements of victims and witnesses relating to sexual abuse or misconduct from disclosure under FOIL provisions.
Title
Exempts statements of victims and witnesses relating to sexual abuse or misconduct from disclosure under FOIL provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06420 (Same As) 2018-05-08 - referred to codes