NY A07677 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - signed chap.35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - signed chap.35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the implementation of the federal individuals with disabilities education improvement act of 2004.
Title
Extends the implementation of the federal individuals with disabilities education improvement act of 2004.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | signed chap.35 |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5150 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.96 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.96 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05150 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7677