NY A07673 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the timeframe in which an invoice of assessment is to be submitted to the state comptroller.
Title
Relates to the timeframe in which an invoice of assessment is to be submitted to the state comptroller.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.449 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1445 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5926 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.306 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.409 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.409 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05926 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7673