NY A07669 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.285
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.285
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to public access to certain accusatory instruments and preliminary proceedings involving adolescent offenders.
Title
Relates to public access to certain accusatory instruments and preliminary proceedings involving adolescent offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.285 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.460 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |