NY A07663 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s7443a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the state university of New York to lease a portion of the lands on the campus of SUNY Buffalo State University for the relocation and operation of the Leonardo da Vinci High School; relates to the computation of building aid for the renovation and equipping of the Leonardo da Vinci high school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the state university of New York to lease a portion of the lands on the campus of SUNY Buffalo State University for the relocation and operation of the Leonardo da Vinci High School; relates to the computation of building aid for the renovation and equipping of the Leonardo da Vinci high school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-10Assemblysubstituted by s7443a
2023-06-10Assemblyrules report cal.856
2023-06-10Assemblyreported
2023-06-10Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-06-10Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2023-06-05Assemblyprint number 7663a
2023-06-05Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2023-05-31Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S07443 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.603

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback