NY A07658 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - substituted by s4314a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - substituted by s4314a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits commercial feed manufacturers to use the term "human food grade" for certain pet food if it conforms to certain state and federal standards.
Title
Permits commercial feed manufacturers to use the term "human food grade" for certain pet food if it conforms to certain state and federal standards.
Sponsors
Asm. Tony Simone [D] | Asm. Anna Kelles [D] | Asm. Alex Bores [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s4314a |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.665 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | print number 7658a |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S04314 (Same As) 2023-11-17 - VETOED MEMO.76