NY A07654 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s6707
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s6707
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of the North Shore water authority to protect, preserve and enhance the quality and quantity of the water within its supply area; defines terms; creates the water authority of the North Shore district and the water authority of North Shore; establishes the powers, bonds and moneys of the authority; makes related provisions.
Title
Relates to the establishment of the North Shore water authority to protect, preserve and enhance the quality and quantity of the water within its supply area; defines terms; creates the water authority of the North Shore district and the water authority of North Shore; establishes the powers, bonds and moneys of the authority; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s6707 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.619 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06707 (Same As) 2021-11-03 - SIGNED CHAP.577