NY A07643 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s7139
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s7139
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Suffolk county as the "Trooper Thomas J. Consorte Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Suffolk county as the "Trooper Thomas J. Consorte Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Asm. Jodi Giglio [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s7139 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.682 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | print number 7643a |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07139 (Same As) 2021-10-31 - SIGNED CHAP.548