NY A07642 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to a reduced retirement age for certain Triborough bridge and tunnel authority employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to a reduced retirement age for certain Triborough bridge and tunnel authority employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29Senatetabled
2017-11-29Senatevetoed memo.181
2017-11-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.2177
2017-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6594
2017-06-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-15Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.346
2017-06-15Assemblyrules report cal.346
2017-06-15Assemblyreported
2017-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-05-23Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-05-05Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S06594 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7642

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07642&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07642&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07642
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07642&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07642&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07642&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07642&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A7642#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback