NY A07639 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the birds and bees protection act; prohibits the sale of certain pesticides and requires the commissioner of environmental conservation to report on the use of certain pesticides; requires the department of environmental conservation to consider a strategy for the development of pollinator friendly lands; requires the department of environmental conservation to distribute information to protect migratory birds.
Title
Enacts the birds and bees protection act; prohibits the sale of certain pesticides and requires the commissioner of environmental conservation to report on the use of certain pesticides; requires the department of environmental conservation to consider a strategy for the development of pollinator friendly lands; requires the department of environmental conservation to distribute information to protect migratory birds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 7639a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05816 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION