NY A07639 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - print number 7639a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - print number 7639a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for public comment during the initial development, preparation and promulgation of rules; establishes an affirmative duty upon agencies to reach out to regulated persons who may be adversely affected by a proposed rule, and to obtain such persons' comments and cost estimates.
Title
Provides for public comment during the initial development, preparation and promulgation of rules; establishes an affirmative duty upon agencies to reach out to regulated persons who may be adversely affected by a proposed rule, and to obtain such persons' comments and cost estimates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | Assembly | print number 7639a |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02160 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES