NY A07639 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adjournments in contemplation of dismissal and suspended judgments in child protective proceedings in family court.
Title
Relates to adjournments in contemplation of dismissal and suspended judgments in child protective proceedings in family court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2012-02-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-02-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.256 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.78 |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.78 |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-05-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06678 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES