NY A07634 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-02 - print number 7634b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Excludes a production using artificial intelligence or autonomous vehicles in a manner which results in the displacement of employees whose salaries are qualified expenses from the definition of qualified film for the purposes of the empire state film production credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Excludes a production using artificial intelligence or autonomous vehicles in a manner which results in the displacement of employees whose salaries are qualified expenses from the definition of qualified film for the purposes of the empire state film production credit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-02Assemblyprint number 7634b
2024-05-02Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-10-11Assemblyprint number 7634a
2023-10-11Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2023-05-25Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S07422 (Same As) 2024-03-27 - PRINT NUMBER 7422B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback