NY A07629 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-14 - print number 7629a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-14 - print number 7629a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires events held by the state or on state property which include alcohol to include alcohol produced within the state.
Title
Requires events held by the state or on state property which include alcohol to include alcohol produced within the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Assembly | print number 7629a |
2024-05-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S09151 (Same As) 2024-05-01 - REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS