NY A07625 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to financial liability for major facilities, vessels, and railroads.
Title
Relates to financial liability for major facilities, vessels, and railroads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.304 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.572 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.572 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05751 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION