NY A07617 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.258
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.258
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to New York bred harness races.
Title
Relates to New York bred harness races.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | signed chap.258 |
2014-08-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-05-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.92 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5330B |
2014-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.539 |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | committed to racing and wagering |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.371 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.273 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.273 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7617a |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S05330 (Same As) 2014-05-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7617A