NY A07615 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - substituted by s7430
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - substituted by s7430
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions authorizing the county of Hamilton to impose a county recording tax on obligations secured by mortgages on real property to December 1, 2025.
Title
Extends certain provisions authorizing the county of Hamilton to impose a county recording tax on obligations secured by mortgages on real property to December 1, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s7430 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.739 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07430 (Same As) 2023-08-23 - SIGNED CHAP.348