NY A07615 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6765
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6765
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system constituting the Sunrise Highway Speonk Riverhead Rd. overpass on route 27, in the town of Southampton, county of Suffolk, as the "State Trooper Jose A. Rosado Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system constituting the Sunrise Highway Speonk Riverhead Rd. overpass on route 27, in the town of Southampton, county of Suffolk, as the "State Trooper Jose A. Rosado Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s6765 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.725 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.725 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06765 (Same As) 2021-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.415