NY A07615 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "save New York call center jobs act"; requires prior notice of relocation of call center jobs from New York to a foreign country; directs the commissioner of labor to maintain a list of employers who move call center jobs; prohibits loans or grants.
Title
Enacts the "save New York call center jobs act"; requires prior notice of relocation of call center jobs from New York to a foreign country; directs the commissioner of labor to maintain a list of employers who move call center jobs; prohibits loans or grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.535 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.550 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.550 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | print number 7615a |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06282 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS