NY A07611 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits proceeds from the auction or sale of carbon dioxide emission allowances pursuant to New York's participation in the regional greenhouse gas initiative (RGGI) from being transferred into the state general fund; provides that if such proceeds are transferred to the state general fund, they shall be used for the purposes directed by the RGGI.
Title
Prohibits proceeds from the auction or sale of carbon dioxide emission allowances pursuant to New York's participation in the regional greenhouse gas initiative (RGGI) from being transferred into the state general fund; provides that if such proceeds are transferred to the state general fund, they shall be used for the purposes directed by the RGGI.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7611b |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.261 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.774 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.774 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | print number 7611a |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06268 (Same As) 2022-03-08 - PRINT NUMBER 6268B