NY A07610 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits broad indemnification by a design professional of a state or local agency or political subdivision involving public work for contracts except to the extent that damages were caused by or the result of the negligence, recklessness, or willful misconduct of the design professional.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits broad indemnification by a design professional of a state or local agency or political subdivision involving public work for contracts except to the extent that damages were caused by or the result of the negligence, recklessness, or willful misconduct of the design professional.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-15Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2023-05-25Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S06059 (Same As) 2024-05-06 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback