NY A07604 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.198
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.198
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to involuntary care and treatment and to whom an application for such admission is made.
Title
Relates to involuntary care and treatment and to whom an application for such admission is made.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Senate | signed chap.198 |
2017-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2172 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6154 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.404 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.404 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S06154 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7604