NY A07602 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any funds paid to a support collection unit which have not been disbursed after two years after diligent efforts to locate the person entitled to such funds, and funds which the remitter of such funds has not provided sufficient identifying information to associate the funds with an existing account shall be paid to the state comptroller.
Title
Provides that any funds paid to a support collection unit which have not been disbursed after two years after diligent efforts to locate the person entitled to such funds, and funds which the remitter of such funds has not provided sufficient identifying information to associate the funds with an existing account shall be paid to the state comptroller.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7602a |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | referred to social services |